|
02/04/2014
|
Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2013
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 1680.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2111.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 867.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 787.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|