Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to Com. on ED.) suspended. (Page 5606.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2014
|
Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on ED. and TRANS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2664.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2645.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 468.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|