08/12/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2013. | |||
08/12/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 08/06/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 07/08/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 1682.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2151.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2013 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 947.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 880.) (May 8). | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |