|
08/27/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1850.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2482.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 973.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 852.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|