|
10/02/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 497, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 2038.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 2718.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 941.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 787.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|