Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2014 | Set for hearing January 23. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2014 | Set for hearing January 21. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2574.) (January 8). | ||
Senate | 01/06/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 12/19/2013 | Set for hearing January 8. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |