Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |