California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB562 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 17, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill June 18, 2013
Bill April 30, 2013