California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB563 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2013

Amended

Bill August 5, 2013
Bill June 19, 2013