Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 7.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 906.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 852.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 697.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|