|
02/27/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2013
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 2381.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 33. Page 3186.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2947.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 1149.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Made Special Order for Wednesday, May 29, at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1016.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 568.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|