California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB57 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill February 11, 2013