Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 406.) (April 3). | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |