|
08/28/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 185, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2604.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
From consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 948.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 695.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|