Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Set for hearing May 1. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2013 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |