Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1105.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1017.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 666.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|