Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 617.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |