|
10/03/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 520, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2038.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 2720.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1178.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1017.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 389.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected March 12).
|
|
|