|
09/06/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 217, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2673.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1117.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 787.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|