Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 806.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 719.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 563.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|