BILL NUMBER: SB 600AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 28, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 23, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 8, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Lieu FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act to add Section 43006.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 600, as amended, Lieu. Vehicles: alternative fuel. Existing law generally designates the State Air Resources Board as the state agency with the primary responsibility for the control of vehicular air pollution. Existing law authorizes the State Air Resources Board to certify the fuel system of any motor vehicle powered by a fuel other than gasoline or diesel if it meets certain standards and to adopt test procedures for that certification. This bill, commencing January 1, 2014, would require the state board to use specified procedures for small volume manufacturers of vehicles seeking to have alternative fuel conversion systems certified by the state board. The bill would require the state board, commencing January 1, 2014, to extend the life of a new vehicle or engine certification until December 31 of the year following a given vehicle model year. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 43006.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 43006.5. (a) Commencing January 1, 2014, for purposes of small volume manufacturers of vehicles seeking to have alternative fuel conversion systems certified by the state board, the state board shall do all of the following: (1) Use federal test procedures, as described in Subpart F (commencing with Section 85.501) of Part 85 of Subchapter C of Chapter 1 of Title 40 of the Code of Federal Regulations. (2) Certify to federal tailpipe emissions standards and On-Board Diagnostics II (OBD II) standards so long as they meet or improve on the standards to which the original equipment manufacturer certified on the original fuel. (3) (1) Automatically qualify new vehicle alternative fuel conversion certifications for aftermarket certifications if requested. Requests may be made with a one-page letter and additional documentation necessary for labeling and warranty. (4) (2) Use commercially available fuel for all required emissions testing. (5) (3) Conduct evaporative emissions testing only on the added alternative fuel system when seeking to certify a dual-fuel vehicle conversion. (b) Commencing January 1, 2014, the state board shall extend the life of a new vehicle or engine certification until December 31 of the year following a given vehicle model year.