California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB600 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill June 30, 2014
Bill June 12, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013