Senate | 02/06/2014 | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Corbett. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 13. Noes 18. Page 1188.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1188.) | ||
Senate | 05/28/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 852.) (May 7). | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2013 | Set for hearing May 7. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |