California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB605 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2014

Amended

Bill August 29, 2014
Bill August 18, 2014
Bill July 3, 2013
Bill June 18, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013