Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 664.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |