Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2013 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |