California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB61 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2013

Amended

Bill September 4, 2013
Bill July 2, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill April 30, 2013
Bill April 3, 2013