California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB618 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill June 27, 2013
Bill April 15, 2013