Assembly | 01/28/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2665.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2645.) (January 23). | ||
Senate | 01/21/2014 | Set for hearing January 23. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2013 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 643.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 405.) (April 3). | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |