California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB619 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/06/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SB 619AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 6, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 16, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Yee (Coauthors: Senators Lara and Wyland) FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act to add Section 33319.4 to the Education Code, and to amend Section 19995 of the Government Code, relating to state employees. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 619, as amended, Yee. State employees: training: civics orientation. Existing law requires the Department of Human Resources (CalHR) to devise plans for and cooperate with appointing powers and other supervising officials in the conduct of employee training programs so that the quality of service rendered by persons in the state civil service may be continually improved. This bill would require the State Department of Education, on or before January 1, 2015, to develop and make available online a state employee civics orientation on federal and state government  . The bill would require private matching funds before any appropriation to the State Department of Education for those purposes is encumbered   , subject to a determination by the Department   of Finance that sufficient private funding has been secured to support those activities  . The bill would require, if the orientation is developed  as prescribed  , an appointing power or other supervising official for an employee hired, promoted, or reclassified after July 1, 2015, to certify annually to CalHR that the employee has completed that orientation. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 33319.4 is added to the Education Code, to read: 33319.4. (a) On or before January 1, 2015, the State Department of  Education shall, to the extent that moneys may be encumbered pursuant to   Education, if funding has been determined to be secured in accordance with  subdivision (b),  shall  develop and make available online a state employee civics orientation on federal and state government to facilitate a basic understanding of the responsibilities and operation of the three branches of government and the importance of civic engagement. The orientation shall include practical examples and shall be updated as necessary.  (b) Moneys, or a portion of moneys, appropriated to the State Department of Education by the Legislature for the development of the orientation pursuant to subdivision (a) shall not be encumbered unless the total amount encumbered is matched by private funds. Moneys appropriated that are not matched by private funds shall revert to the General Fund.   (b) The online orientation described in subdivision (a) shall be developed and made available pursuant to this section only after the Department of Finance determines that private funds, in an amount sufficient to fully support the activities described in subdivision (a), have been deposited with the state. If the Department of Finance determines that sufficient funding has been secured to support those activities, the Department of Finance shall file a written statement with the Secretary of the Senate, the Chief Clerk of the Assembly, and the Legislative Counsel memorializing that this determination has been made.  SEC. 2. Section 19995 of the Government Code is amended to read: 19995. (a) The department shall devise plans for and cooperate with appointing powers and other supervising officials in the conduct of employee training programs so that the quality of service rendered by persons in the state civil service may be continually improved. (b) The appointing power or other supervising official for an employee hired, promoted, or reclassified after July 1, 2015, using existing processes and resources,  shall,  if the employee training described in Section 33319.4 of the Education Code is  developed,   developed in accordance with that section, shall  certify annually to the department that the employee has completed this employee training. (c) If the provisions of this section are in conflict with the provisions of a memorandum of understanding reached pursuant to Section 3517.5, the memorandum of understanding shall be controlling without further legislative action, except that if  such   those  provisions of a memorandum of understanding require the expenditure of funds, the provisions shall not become effective unless approved by the Legislature in the annual Budget Act.