Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 406.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |