California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB633 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 24, 2014
Bill August 6, 2013
Bill May 6, 2013
Bill April 11, 2013
Bill April 2, 2013