Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 6. Page 640.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |