Senate
|
02/03/2014
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2014
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 660.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|