|
02/27/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2013
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2275.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 31. Page 2881.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 772.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 666.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|