|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 724, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2371.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3135.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2939.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 948.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 791.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 486.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|