LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB654
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB654
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB654
Compare Versions
SB654 Enrolled September 19, 2013
SB654 Amended September 3, 2013
SB654 Amended June 26, 2013
SB654 Amended May 24, 2013
SB654 Amended April 1, 2013
SB654 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB654 Enrolled September 19, 2013
SB654 Amended September 3, 2013
SB654 Amended June 26, 2013
SB654 Amended May 24, 2013
SB654 Amended April 1, 2013
SB654 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare