Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 697.) (April 24). | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |