05/30/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2013. | |||
05/30/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 05/28/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 1524.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 50. Noes 18. Page 1444.) Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 901.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4. Page 880.) (May 9). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected May 9). | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Set for hearing May 9 in B. & F.R. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |