|
09/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 549, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6017.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to L. Gov.) suspended. (Page 5488.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2637.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2014
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2615.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2014
|
Set for hearing January 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|