|
09/24/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 349, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2137.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2843.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2795.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1118.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 734.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 464.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|