|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 726, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 4. Page 2831.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 867.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 788.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|