|
10/04/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 544, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2372.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3140.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2942.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 7). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 968.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 759.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|