California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB702 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2014

Amended

Bill June 30, 2014
Bill June 2, 2014
Bill May 14, 2013