Senate | 05/24/2013 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 757.) | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |