California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB71 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2013

Enrolled

Bill June 25, 2013

Chaptered

Bill June 27, 2013

Amended

Bill June 19, 2013
Bill June 12, 2013