|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 833, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4806.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6017.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2638.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2623.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2014
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2615.) (January 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2014
|
Set for hearing January 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|