LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB721
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB721
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB721
Compare Versions
SB721 Chaptered June 25, 2014
SB721 Enrolled June 20, 2014
SB721 Amended June 9, 2014
SB721 Amended June 2, 2014
SB721 Amended August 5, 2013
SB721 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB721 Chaptered June 25, 2014
SB721 Enrolled June 20, 2014
SB721 Amended June 9, 2014
SB721 Amended June 2, 2014
SB721 Amended August 5, 2013
SB721 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare