07/11/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2013. | |||
07/11/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 07/03/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2249.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2013 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 947.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 853.) (May 7). | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2013 | Set for hearing May 7. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |