06/27/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2013. | |||
06/27/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/19/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 1.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2032.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 9. Page 2037.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2013 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 892.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |